TX SB2242 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Medina County Water Control and Improvement District No. 4; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Medina County Water Control and Improvement District No. 4; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-05-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2021-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4668 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
HB4668 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
HB4668 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
MEDINA COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 4
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.