TX SB2230 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the acquisition of real property or construction of buildings for the purpose of operating the Texas Bullion Depository.
Title
Relating to the acquisition of real property or construction of buildings for the purpose of operating the Texas Bullion Depository.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1500 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-26 | House | Objections withdrawn |
2021-05-26 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (contested) |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2021-05-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Seliger |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4670 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Left pending in committee
HB4670 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Left pending in committee
HB4670 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
BONDS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Financial
Financial--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
TEXAS BULLION DEPOSITORY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Financial
Financial--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
TEXAS BULLION DEPOSITORY, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER