TX SB2221 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain criminal defendants for an order of nondisclosure.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain criminal defendants for an order of nondisclosure.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-15 | Read first time | |
2009-05-05 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION