TX SB2219 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the notice required before the issuance of certain debt obligations by political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to the notice required before the issuance of certain debt obligations by political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Birdwell |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB477 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
BONDS
City Government
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
City Government
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate