TX SB2212 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain real estate sales, brokerage, and advertising activities, certain functions of the Texas Real Estate Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain real estate sales, brokerage, and advertising activities, certain functions of the Texas Real Estate Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1615 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26SenateRecord vote
2017-05-26SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-26SenateRead
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-11HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenatePassed
2017-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-29SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback