TX SB220 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the abolition of the office of the fire fighters' pension commissioner and the transfer and disposition of its functions relating to the Texas Emergency Services Retirement System and the Texas local firefighters retirement systems.
Title
Relating to the abolition of the office of the fire fighters' pension commissioner and the transfer and disposition of its functions relating to the Texas Emergency Services Retirement System and the Texas local firefighters retirement systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - SB 220Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | See remarks for effective date | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed |
2013-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2013-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-15 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2013-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
FIRE FIGHTERS' PENSION COMMISSIONER, OFFICE OF
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Sunset--Recommended Reviews
FIRE FIGHTERS' PENSION COMMISSIONER, OFFICE OF
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Sunset--Recommended Reviews