TX SB22 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a Pathways in Technology Early College High School (P-TECH) program and to the repeal of the tech-prep program.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a Pathways in Technology Early College High School (P-TECH) program and to the repeal of the tech-prep program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1421 (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1395 (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1395 (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Science & Technology
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Science & Technology
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS