TX SB22 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of the Texas Water Development Board; making an appropriation from the economic stabilization fund to finance certain water-related projects.
Title
Relating to the administration of the Texas Water Development Board; making an appropriation from the economic stabilization fund to finance certain water-related projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Filed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Governor
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Water--Development
Water--General
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Water--Development
Water--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB22 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00022I.htm |