TX SB2188 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the average daily attendance calculation for students over 18 years of age who are in an off home campus instructional arrangement.
Title
Relating to the average daily attendance calculation for students over 18 years of age who are in an off home campus instructional arrangement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance