TX SB217 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-11 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-11 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to expulsion of a public school student who commits certain criminal acts involving a computer, computer network, or computer system owned by or operated on behalf of a school district.
Title
Relating to expulsion of a public school student who commits certain criminal acts involving a computer, computer network, or computer system owned by or operated on behalf of a school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-04-11 | Read first time | |
2011-04-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-30 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Education | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-17 | Filed | |
2010-11-17 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Electronic Information Systems
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Electronic Information Systems