TX SB2168 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disclosure of records produced in the course of an investigation related to educator misconduct.
Title
Relating to the disclosure of records produced in the course of an investigation related to educator misconduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |