TX SB216 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures related to the placement of a voter on the suspense list.
Title
Relating to procedures related to the placement of a voter on the suspense list.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Elections | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-06 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-17 | Filed | |
2010-11-17 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |