TX SB2149 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-20 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-20 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to early in-person voting by voters who reside at a residential care facility.
Title
Relating to early in-person voting by voters who reside at a residential care facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-05-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Early Voting
LONG-TERM CARE
Nursing Homes
SECRETARY OF STATE
Disabilities, Persons with
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Early Voting
LONG-TERM CARE
Nursing Homes
SECRETARY OF STATE