TX SB2145 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the public school finance system.
Title
Relating to the public school finance system.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Taxation
Taxation--School District
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Taxation
Taxation--School District
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2145 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02145I.htm |