TX SB2141 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requirements for a representative for a student in a special education due process hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for a representative for a student in a special education due process hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-19HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-16HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-16HouseRead first time
2017-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-15SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenatePassed
2017-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15SenateAmended
2017-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-15SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-29SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback