TX SB2131 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to efforts to facilitate the completion by students of undergraduate certificate and degree programs.
Title
Relating to efforts to facilitate the completion by students of undergraduate certificate and degree programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1604 (Y: 130 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1603 (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1603 (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COUNSELING & THERAPY
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS