TX SB2122 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the coordination of the transfer of course credit between public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the coordination of the transfer of course credit between public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
Electronic Information Systems
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TRANSFER STUDENTS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
Electronic Information Systems
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TRANSFER STUDENTS