TX SB210 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the required repeal or amendment of two state agency rules before adoption of a new state agency rule that increases costs to regulated persons.
Title
Relating to the required repeal or amendment of two state agency rules before adoption of a new state agency rule that increases costs to regulated persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |