TX SB21 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 66-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the qualifications, duties, and limitations of Texas delegates to a convention called under Article V of the United States Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the qualifications, duties, and limitations of Texas delegates to a convention called under Article V of the United States Constitution.

Sponsors

Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]
Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Donald Huffines [R]Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Kel Seliger [R]
Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Konni Burton [R]Sen. Robert Nichols [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]
Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1850 (Y: 113 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#736 (Y: 119 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Amendment adopted as amended (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Amendment amended (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Motion to table fails (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - FA1 Estes (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06 Effective immediately
2017-06-06 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-25SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-24HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-23SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-21SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-21SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-19HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-19HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-15HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-15HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-15HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-10SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-10SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-10SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-10SenateRead
2017-05-10SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-05SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on Emergency Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseReferred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
2017-04-10HouseRead first time
2017-03-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-02-28SenateReported engrossed
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenatePassed
2017-02-28SenateRead 3rd time
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateAmendment amended
2017-02-28SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-02-28SenateAmendment to amendment withdrawn
2017-02-28SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-02-28SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateAmended
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateMotion to table fails
2017-02-28SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateAmended
2017-02-28SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-02-28SenateRead 2nd time
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-02-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-02-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-02-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-02-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2016-12-06SenateFiled
2016-12-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB21
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00021I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00021S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00021E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00021H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00021F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ02-28-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB21&RcdVtNo=736&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB21&RcdVtNo=1850&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ02-28-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ02-28-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ02-28-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ02-28-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=107

Bill Comments

feedback