TX SB2089 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a health care facility's policies regarding advance directives or health care or treatment decisions made by or on behalf of patients.
Title
Relating to a health care facility's policies regarding advance directives or health care or treatment decisions made by or on behalf of patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Lucio |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3158 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
ADVANCE DIRECTIVES
Disabilities, Persons with
Family
Family--General
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
RESPECTING TEXAS PATIENTS' RIGHT TO LIFE ACT OF 2019
Disabilities, Persons with
Family
Family--General
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
RESPECTING TEXAS PATIENTS' RIGHT TO LIFE ACT OF 2019