TX SB207 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority and duties of the office of inspector general of the Health and Human Services Commission.
Title
Relating to the authority and duties of the office of inspector general of the Health and Human Services Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Rep. Larry Gonzales [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-30 - House - SB 207Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - SB 207Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - SB 207Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | House | Passed |
2015-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-23 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-23 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-05-05 | House | Correction in referral |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2015-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-22 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
AUDITS & AUDITORS
FRAUD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Human Services--Food Programs
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
AUDITS & AUDITORS
FRAUD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Human Services--Food Programs
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills