TX SB2065 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the licensing and regulation of certain occupations and activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the licensing and regulation of certain occupations and activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2022 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - Motion prevails RV#1935 (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Point of order overruled RV#1623 (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1583 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amendment amended RV#1582 (Y: 74 N: 64 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - RV#1581 (Y: 84 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - 9-Walle RV#1580 (Y: 73 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - 6-Rinaldi, Schofield, Swanson, Lang, Landgraf, Schaefer, R. Anderson, Meyer, Phelan, Kuempel, More RV#1579 (Y: 76 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - 1-Kuempel RV#1578 (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees w/inst-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees with instructions
2017-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseMotion prevails
2017-05-26HouseMotion to instruct conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmendment as amended withdrawn
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseAmendment amended
2017-05-22HousePoint of order overruled (amendment)
2017-05-22HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-11HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-24SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenatePassed
2017-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-28SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2065
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02065I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02065S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02065E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02065H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB02065F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-24-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2065&RcdVtNo=1578&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2065&RcdVtNo=1579&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2065&RcdVtNo=1580&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2065&RcdVtNo=1581&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2065&RcdVtNo=1582&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2065&RcdVtNo=1583&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2065&RcdVtNo=1623&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2065&RcdVtNo=1935&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB2065&RcdVtNo=2022&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=76

Bill Comments

feedback