TX SB2053 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the distribution of the consolidated court cost.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the distribution of the consolidated court cost.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1331 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HousePassed
2017-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-11HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-02HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-02HouseRead first time
2017-04-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-27SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenatePassed
2017-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenatePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-04-27SenateLaid out as postponed business
2017-04-27SenatePostponed
2017-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-25SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-28SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-28SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback