TX SB2038 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-4)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-4)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to release of an area from a municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction by petition or election.
Title
Relating to release of an area from a municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction by petition or election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Amended RV#988 (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Amended RV#962 (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Amended RV#893 (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Amended RV#988 (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Amended RV#962 (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Amended RV#893 (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-08 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#988 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed as amended |
2023-05-03 | House | Amended 3-C. Bell |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment withdrawn 2-C. Bell |
2023-05-03 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2023-05-03 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2023-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed as amended |
2023-05-03 | House | Amended 2-C. Bell |
2023-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-05-03 | House | Postponed |
2023-05-03 | House | Amended 1-C. Bell |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#893 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-02 | House | Amended 2-Lujan |
2023-05-02 | House | Amended 1-C. Bell |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 5217 |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2023-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB5217 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB5217 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB5217 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Annexation
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
Military & Veterans
City Government--Annexation
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
Military & Veterans