TX SB2038 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Vetoed by the Governor
Status: Vetoed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Vetoed by the Governor
Summary
Relating to the construction of nonsubstantive codifications and revisions of statutes.
Title
Relating to the construction of nonsubstantive codifications and revisions of statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-18 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-15 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-15 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-14 | Record vote | |
2009-05-14 | Passed | |
2009-05-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-13 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-13 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-12 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4126 (Similar To) 2009-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call