TX SB2016 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-22 - Referred to Urban Affairs
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-22 - Referred to Urban Affairs
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to limitations on annexation by, extraterritorial jurisdiction of, and the authority to provide electric service of certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to limitations on annexation by, extraterritorial jurisdiction of, and the authority to provide electric service of certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2015-05-22 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |