TX SB2006 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to erecting or maintaining certain outdoor signs regulated by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to erecting or maintaining certain outdoor signs regulated by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1420 (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-12 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |