TX SB2004 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to deferred maintenance funding for state facilities.
Title
Relating to deferred maintenance funding for state facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - SB 2004Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Effective immediately | |
2015-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-14 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed |
2015-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-13 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-01 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control