TX SB20 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health plan and health benefit plan coverage for abortions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health plan and health benefit plan coverage for abortions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-01HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-01HouseRead first time
2017-03-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-27SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-27SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-03-27SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-03-27SenateRecord vote
2017-03-27SenatePassed
2017-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-27SenateRecord vote
2017-03-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-22SenateRecord vote
2017-03-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-22SenateRecord vote
2017-03-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-28SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-02-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-31SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2017-01-17SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-06SenateFiled
2017-01-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback