TX SB2 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to ad valorem taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to ad valorem taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-02-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-02-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-02-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-02-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-06SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2019-01-31SenateFiled
2019-01-31SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback