TX SB2 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
General Appropriations Bill.
Title
General Appropriations Bill.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB2 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00002I.htm |