TX SB1963 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requirements for educator preparation program support for certain candidates for certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for educator preparation program support for certain candidates for certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1736 (Y: 137 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1687 (Y: 115 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-16HouseRead first time
2017-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-15SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenatePassed
2017-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-27SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-27SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1963
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01963I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01963S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01963E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01963H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01963F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-15-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-15-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1963&RcdVtNo=1687&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1963&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1963&RcdVtNo=1736&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017

Bill Comments

feedback