TX SB196 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a notification requirement if a public school, including an open-enrollment charter school, does not have a nurse, school counselor, or librarian assigned to the school during all instructional hours.
Title
Relating to a notification requirement if a public school, including an open-enrollment charter school, does not have a nurse, school counselor, or librarian assigned to the school during all instructional hours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1747 (Y: 80 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Failed to pass to 3rd reading RV#1688 (Y: 67 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1747 (Y: 80 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Failed to pass to 3rd reading RV#1688 (Y: 67 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2017-05-23 | House | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Failed to pass to 3rd reading |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Libraries & Librarians
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
PARENTAL NOTIFICATION
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Libraries & Librarians
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
PARENTAL NOTIFICATION