TX SB1959 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to peace officers commissioned by the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners.
Title
Relating to peace officers commissioned by the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PEACE OFFICERS
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PEACE OFFICERS
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF