TX SB1934 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requirements for the issuance of a driver's license or personal identification certificate and to a study on digital identification and proof of licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for the issuance of a driver's license or personal identification certificate and to a study on digital identification and proof of licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-27 - House - SB 1934Third Reading House (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 2 by Alonzo (Y: 50 N: 91 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-05-27 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 1 by Alonzo (Y: 52 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-05-25 - House - SB 1934Third Reading House (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-20 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-20 Signed by the Governor
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-29SenateRecord vote
2015-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2015-05-29SenateRead
2015-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2015-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2015-05-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27HouseRecord vote
2015-05-27HousePassed
2015-05-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27HouseRecord vote
2015-05-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2015-05-27HouseRecord vote
2015-05-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2015-05-27HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-26HousePostponed
2015-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-25HouseRecord vote
2015-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2015-05-25HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-05-25HouseAmended
2015-05-25HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-05-25HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-05-25HousePoint of order overruled
2015-05-25HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-25HousePostponed
2015-05-25HousePoint of order withdrawn
2015-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-22HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-06HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2015-05-06HouseRead first time
2015-05-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-05-05SenateReported engrossed
2015-05-05SenateRecord vote
2015-05-05SenatePassed
2015-05-05SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-05SenateRecord vote
2015-05-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-05SenateRecord vote
2015-05-05SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-05-05SenateRecord vote
2015-05-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-29SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-25SenateReferred to State Affairs
2015-03-25SenateRead first time
2015-03-13SenateFiled
2015-03-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB1934
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB01934I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB01934S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB01934E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB01934H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB01934F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB1934&RcdVtNo=1446&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB1934&RcdVtNo=1566&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB1934&RcdVtNo=1567&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB1934&RcdVtNo=1568&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2015

Bill Comments 750

feedback