TX SB1929 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-27 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to maternal mortality and morbidity and pregnancy-related deaths, including postpartum depression.
Title
Relating to maternal mortality and morbidity and pregnancy-related deaths, including postpartum depression.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] |
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1718 (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-15 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Women
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Women