TX SB1925 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the dedication of revenue received from certain court costs to the truancy prevention and diversion fund.
Title
Relating to the dedication of revenue received from certain court costs to the truancy prevention and diversion fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TRUANCY
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TRUANCY