TX SB1913 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administrative, civil, and criminal consequences, including fines, fees, and costs, imposed on persons arrested for, charged with, or convicted of certain criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to the administrative, civil, and criminal consequences, including fines, fees, and costs, imposed on persons arrested for, charged with, or convicted of certain criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] |
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. James White [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1967 (Y: 77 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1667 (Y: 75 N: 70 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - 5-White RV#1666 (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1597 (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Failed to pass to 3rd reading RV#1573 (Y: 64 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - House - RV#1572 (Y: 80 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1967 (Y: 77 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1667 (Y: 75 N: 70 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - 5-White RV#1666 (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1597 (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Failed to pass to 3rd reading RV#1573 (Y: 64 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - House - RV#1572 (Y: 80 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-23 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2017-05-23 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-23 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-23 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-22 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2017-05-22 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2017-05-22 | House | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration |
2017-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Failed to pass to 3rd reading |
2017-05-22 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-22 | House | Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMMUNITY SERVICE
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Courts
Courts--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Courts
Courts--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local