TX SB1908 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of general obligation bonds by the Lynn County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the issuance of general obligation bonds by the Lynn County Hospital District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - SB 1908Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-18 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed |
2015-05-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-26 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-23 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2015-05-22 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
LYNN COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital