TX SB1902 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of criminal defendants for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of criminal defendants for an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - SB 1902Third Reading House (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-20 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-20 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2015-05-26SenateRead
2015-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2015-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2015-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-21HouseRecord vote
2015-05-21HousePassed
2015-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-20HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2015-05-20HouseAmended
2015-05-20HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-05-20HouseAmended
2015-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-06HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2015-05-06HouseRead first time
2015-05-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-05-06SenateCo-author authorized
2015-05-05SenateReported engrossed
2015-05-05SenateRecord vote
2015-05-05SenatePassed
2015-05-05SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-05SenateRecord vote
2015-05-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-05SenateRecord vote
2015-05-05SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-05-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05SenateAmended
2015-05-05SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05SenateAmended
2015-05-05SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05SenateAmended
2015-05-05SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-05SenateRead 2nd time
2015-05-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-05SenateCo-author authorized
2015-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-30SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2015-04-29SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-04-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-25SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2015-03-25SenateRead first time
2015-03-13SenateFiled
2015-03-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback