TX SB19 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-14 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an appropriation of money from the economic stabilization fund to decrease participants' health insurance costs for certain health benefit plans administered by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an appropriation of money from the economic stabilization fund to decrease participants' health insurance costs for certain health benefit plans administered by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-14 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#162 (Y: 86 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-14HouseRecord vote
2017-08-14HouseCalendars Committee rule adopted
2017-08-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-08-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-08-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-08-12HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-08-02HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-08-02HouseRead first time
2017-07-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-07-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenatePassed
2017-07-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-07-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-26SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-25SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-25SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-07-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-25SenateAmended
2017-07-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-25SenateRead 2nd time
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-07-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-24SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-07-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-07-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-07-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20SenateReferred to Finance
2017-07-20SenateRead first time
2017-07-20SenateFiled
2017-07-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=SB19
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00019I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00019S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00019E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00019H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-25-F1.PDF#page=42
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-25-F1.PDF#page=44
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-25-F1.PDF#page=45
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-25-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=SB19&RcdVtNo=162&Ch=H&Dt=08/14/2017

Bill Comments

feedback