TX SB1893 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administrative judicial regions in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administrative judicial regions in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1536 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26SenateRecord vote
2017-05-26SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-26SenateRead
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed as amended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-21HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-20HousePostponed
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateAmended
2017-05-04SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-03SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1893
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01893I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01893S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01893E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01893H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01893F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-04-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1893&RcdVtNo=1536&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-04-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=44

Bill Comments

feedback