TX SB188 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to civil liability for removing certain individuals or animals from a motor vehicle and criminal liability for removing certain animals from a motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to civil liability for removing certain individuals or animals from a motor vehicle and criminal liability for removing certain animals from a motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-24HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenatePassed
2017-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20SenateAmended
2017-04-20SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20SenateAmended
2017-04-20SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-20SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-25SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-25SenateRead first time
2016-11-14SenateFiled
2016-11-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback