TX SB1867 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the scope of practice for chiropractors.
Title
Relating to the scope of practice for chiropractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2733 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Subjects
CHIROPRACTIC & CHIROPRACTORS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations