TX SB1854 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to creating a recognition day in honor of Dolores C. Huerta.
Title
Relating to creating a recognition day in honor of Dolores C. Huerta.
Sponsors
Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] | Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-15 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-14 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Administration | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |