TX SB1849 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to interactions between law enforcement and individuals detained or arrested on suspicion of the commission of criminal offenses, to the confinement, conviction, or release of those individuals, and to grants supporting populations that are more likely to interact frequently with law enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to interactions between law enforcement and individuals detained or arrested on suspicion of the commission of criminal offenses, to the confinement, conviction, or release of those individuals, and to grants supporting populations that are more likely to interact frequently with law enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1417 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1394 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HousePassed
2017-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-05-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-11SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenatePassed
2017-05-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2017-05-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11SenateAmendment amended
2017-05-11SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-05-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11SenateAmendment amended
2017-05-11SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-05-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-11SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-11SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback