TX SB1843 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to providing an opportunity for public high school students in grades 10 through 12 to take the Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery test or an alternative vocational aptitude test.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to providing an opportunity for public high school students in grades 10 through 12 to take the Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery test or an alternative vocational aptitude test.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback