TX SB1842 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to an application for the amendment of a certificate of public convenience and necessity in an area within the boundaries of a political subdivision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to an application for the amendment of a certificate of public convenience and necessity in an area within the boundaries of a political subdivision.


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1566 (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1531 (Y: 34 N: 85 NV: 15 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26SenateRecord vote
2017-05-26SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-21HouseVote reconsidered
2017-05-21HouseVote reconsidered
2017-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-17HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-04-F1.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1842&RcdVtNo=1531&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1842&RcdVtNo=1566&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=36

Bill Comments