TX SB1839 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the preparation, certification, and classification of and professional development for public school educators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the preparation, certification, and classification of and professional development for public school educators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#2042 (Y: 138 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Rules suspended RV#2041 (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1609 (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - 3-Huberty RV#1567 (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-29HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-29SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseRules suspended
2017-05-28House1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed as amended
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-12HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateAmended
2017-05-04SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-02SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1839
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01839I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01839S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01839E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01839H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01839F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-04-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1839&RcdVtNo=1567&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1839&RcdVtNo=1609&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1839&RcdVtNo=2041&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1839&RcdVtNo=2042&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=56

Bill Comments

feedback