TX SB1818 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a competitive and integrated employment initiative for certain Medicaid recipients.
Title
Relating to a competitive and integrated employment initiative for certain Medicaid recipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3916 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
MEDICAID